RI S2464 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-17 - Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires health insurance contracts, plans and policies to cover the services of doctors licensed for acupuncture and Oriental medicine.
Title
Health Insurance
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/02/2016) |
2016-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended Substitute A be held for further study |
2016-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended indefinite postponement |
2016-05-13 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2016) |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/31/2016) |
2016-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |