RI S2444 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-05-26 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Public Property And Works -- State Purchases (would Add Certain Definitions Regarding "construction Management At-risk" Services To The State Purchases Chapter)
Title
An Act Relating To Public Property And Works -- State Purchases (would Add Certain Definitions Regarding "construction Management At-risk" Services To The State Purchases Chapter)
Sponsors
Sen. Leo Blais [R] | Sen. Charles Levesque [D] | Sen. Charles Levesque [D] | Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] |
Sen. Edward O'Neil [I] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-26 | Referred to House Finance | |
2010-05-25 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-05-19 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-18 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-13 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-13 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Government Oversight |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2444.pdf |