RI S2437 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-06-09 - Committee heard and continued
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Hazardous Waste Cleanup (would Exempt From Liability A Person Who In The Normal Course Of Government Duties Provides Assistance Or Services In Mitigating Hazardous Discharge, To Further Include Local Fire Departments, Districts And Representatives Of The Rhode Island Dem)
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Hazardous Waste Cleanup (would Exempt From Liability A Person Who In The Normal Course Of Government Duties Provides Assistance Or Services In Mitigating Hazardous Discharge, To Further Include Local Fire Departments, Districts And Representatives Of The Rhode Island Dem)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-09 | Committee heard and continued | |
2010-06-09 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-06-01 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-06-01 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-05-04 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2010-04-28 | Senate held on desk | |
2010-04-28 | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) | |
2010-04-15 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-04-14 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended | |
2010-04-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-10 | Scheduled for hearing | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2437.pdf |