RI S2436 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on March 28 2024 - 50% progression
Action: 2024-03-29 - Referred to House Labor
Pending: House Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
LABOR AND LABOR RELATIONS -- RHODE ISLAND NONCOMPETITION AGREEMENT ACT - Prohibits noncompete agreements except for noncompete agreements between a seller and buyer of a business; creates civil action for an employer for the violation of an agreement by employee regarding disclosure or wrongful utilization of trade secrets.
Title
Prohibits noncompete agreements except for noncompete agreements between a seller and buyer of a business; creates civil action for an employer for the violation of an agreement by employee regarding disclosure or wrongful utilization of trade secrets.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 34 N: 0 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-29 | House | Referred to House Labor |
2024-03-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2024-03-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/28/2024) |
2024-03-19 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2024-03-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/19/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |