RI S2429 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 25 2010 - 100% progression
Action: 2010-06-25 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Assisted Living Residence Licensing Act (change The Definition Of "resident" For The Purposes Of The Assisted Living Residence Licensing Act By Eliminating The Requirement That The Resident Already Be "established")
Title
An Act Relating To Health And Safety -- Assisted Living Residence Licensing Act (change The Definition Of "resident" For The Purposes Of The Assisted Living Residence Licensing Act By Eliminating The Requirement That The Resident Already Be "established")
Sponsors
Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Beatrice Lanzi [D] | Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Sen. John Tassoni [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-25 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2010-06-17 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2010-06-11 | House passed Sub A in concurrence | |
2010-06-09 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2010-06-04 | Referred to House H.E.W. | |
2010-06-03 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-06-02 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-06-02 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-06-02 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-04-14 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-04-14 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2429.pdf |