RI S2409 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2024 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-16 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Housing and Municipal Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- STATE BUILDING CODE -- RHODE ISLAND INCLUSIVE HOME DESIGN ACT - Establishes a new article in the state building code that provides that certain new housing construction contain at least one floor that meets the requirements for a Type C "ANSI'' Standards for Accessible and Usable Buildings and Facilities.
Title
Establishes a new article in the state building code that provides that certain new housing construction contain at least one floor that meets the requirements for a Type C "ANSI'' Standards for Accessible and Usable Buildings and Facilities.
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Bell [D] | Sen. Meghan Kallman [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Linda Ujifusa [D] |
Sen. Victoria Gu [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/16/2024) |
2024-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Health And Safety
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- STATE BUILDING CODE
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- STATE BUILDING CODE -- RHODE ISLAND INCLUSIVE HOME DESIGN ACT
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- STATE BUILDING CODE
HEALTH AND SAFETY -- STATE BUILDING CODE -- RHODE ISLAND INCLUSIVE HOME DESIGN ACT
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText24/SenateText24/S2409.pdf |