RI S2379 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 10 2016 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Prohibits employers from deducting from their employees' wages for spoilage, breakage, cash shortages, losses, fines or penalties for tardiness, misconduct or quitting by an employee without notice.
Title
Payment Of Wages
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2379.pdf |