RI S2361 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Require the Narragansett bay commission to own, operate and maintain sanitary sewer facilities in the city of Pawtucket
Title
Narragansett Bay Commission
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2361.pdf |