RI S2360 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 30 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-03-30 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows Seth Michael Magaziner to join Amy Blais and Sean Malloy in marriage on or about May 7, 2016, within the Town of Bristol, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-03-22 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-30 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2016-03-22 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-03-22 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2016-03-18 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/22/2016) |
2016-03-15 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2016-03-11 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2016) |
2016-03-11 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (03/10/2016) |
2016-02-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-02-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/23/2016) |
2016-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |