RI S2359 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 2 2018 - 100% progression
Action: 2018-07-02 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Requires easement benefited property owners to pay costs to maintain easements or rights-of-way of property of another.
Title
Maintenance Of Private Easements And Rights-of-way
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] |
Roll Calls
2018-06-19 - Senate - And rights-of-way approval of amendment (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2018-06-19 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-07-02 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2018-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2018-06-22 | House | House passed Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-21 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/22/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A as amended in concurrence |
2018-06-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/20/2018) |
2018-06-20 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2018-06-19 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2018-06-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/19/2018) |
2018-06-13 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2018-06-08 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/13/2018) |
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |