RI S2353 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Bipartisan Bill
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 12 2014 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2014-04-10 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Update a law initially enacted in 1896 and last amended in 1990 to address advances in medicine, technology, and how health care is delivered
Title
Board Of Medical Licensure And Discipline
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-04-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/10/2014) |
2014-02-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText14/SenateText14/S2353.pdf |