RI S2344 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Passed on June 24 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-24 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Names Route 4 and Route 1 from Warwick to Westerly The Purple Heart Memorial Highway.
Title
Joint Committee On Naming New Buildings
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. James Sheehan [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
Roll Calls
2020-06-17 - House - Passage (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Committee on naming new building approval of amendment (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Committee on naming new building approval of amendment (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2020-03-04 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-06-24 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-06-17 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2020-06-15 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2020) |
2020-03-05 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2020-03-04 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2020-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (03/04/2020) |
2020-02-26 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/26/2020) |
2020-02-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |