RI S2326 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-03-01 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Commerce Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires every electric distribution company and natural gas distribution company to submit to the division of public utilities and carriers an emergency response plan for review and approval.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/01/2018) |
2018-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2326.pdf |