RI S2325 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on March 17 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-17 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Maryellen Goodwin to join Katiuska Pérez and Brian Parker in marriage on or about September 6, 2020, within the City of Newport, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-12 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-17 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-03-12 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-12 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-03-06 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/12/2020) |
2020-03-05 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2020-02-28 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-26 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-25 | Senate | Removed from Senate Consent Calendar and |
2020-02-12 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/25/2020) |
2020-02-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-02-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/11/2020) |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |