RI S2307 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-06-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires the registration, certification, and regulation of those individuals who provide personal care assistant services to a consumer.
Title
Personal Care Assistant Program
Sponsors
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-06-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-06-01 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/07/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2307.pdf |