RI S2289 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 15 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-03-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
SEE TITLE 16 CHAPTER 97 -- THE RHODE ISLAND BOARD OF EDUCATION ACT) (Authorizes school administration to issue an out-of-school suspension if student is a threat to safety of students, teachers, or administrators; or guilty of violating school regs on alcohol, drugs or controlled substances, or weapons.
Title
School Committees And Superintendents
Sponsors
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Sandra Cano [D] | Sen. Melissa Murray [D] |
Sen. John Burke [D] |
Roll Calls
2022-03-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Education: Be held for further study (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-03-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-03-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/15/2022) |
2022-02-15 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |