RI S2269 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2020 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-03-05 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires a licensed buyer of certain precious metals or articles, tools, and electronics to take a digital photograph of their purchase and upload it to the attorney general's license sales tracking system database.
Title
General Regulatory Provisions -- Purchase And Sale Of Precious Metals
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-05 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2020-02-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText20/SenateText20/S2269.pdf |