RI S2257 | 2012 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2012 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2012-02-09 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Real Property -- Transfer Fees (would Prohibit Transfer Fees Based Upon The Resale Or Subsequent Transfer Of Real Property/would Further Exempt Housing Developers Connected With Sect 45-53-3(6) And Conservative Restrictions As Defined In Sect 34-39-2.)
Title
An Act Relating To Real Property -- Transfer Fees (would Prohibit Transfer Fees Based Upon The Resale Or Subsequent Transfer Of Real Property/would Further Exempt Housing Developers Connected With Sect 45-53-3(6) And Conservative Restrictions As Defined In Sect 34-39-2.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2012-02-09 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2012-02-07 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/09/2012) | |
2012-01-26 | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText12/SenateText12/S2257.pdf |