RI S2252 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 11 2010 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2010-05-27 - Senate passed Sub A
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
Senate Resolution Calling On The United States Environmental Protection Agency To Provide Guidance To The Rhode Island Department Of Environmental Management
Title
Senate Resolution Calling On The United States Environmental Protection Agency To Provide Guidance To The Rhode Island Department Of Environmental Management
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-05-27 | Senate passed Sub A | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar | |
2010-05-26 | Committee recommends passage of Sub A | |
2010-05-26 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-02-11 | Introduced, referred to Senate Constitutional and Regulatory Issues |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2252.pdf |