RI S2228 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on July 1 2014 - 100% progression
Action: 2014-07-01 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Allows tents up to 350 sq. ft. on public commercial land without need for license unless required by fire code, exempts tents for one/two family dwellings from fire marshal jurisdiction, requires training of deputy fire marshals to ensure enforcement.
Title
Tents--grandstands--air-supported Structures
Sponsors
Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Teresa Paiva-Weed [D] | Sen. Louis Dipalma [D] |
Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 70 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-07-01 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2014-06-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2014-06-18 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-17 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/18/2014) |
2014-06-17 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2014-06-15 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/17/2014) |
2014-05-28 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2014-05-27 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2014-05-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/27/2014) |
2014-05-20 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-16 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/20/2014) |
2014-04-01 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-03-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/01/2014) |
2014-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |