RI S2201 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-05-17 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a one time tax credit up to two hundred fifty dollars ($250) per dependent child for certain Rhode Island households who contribute to an account under the Rhode Island college bound tuition savings program.
Title
Personal Income Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. James Seveney [D] | Sen. Donna Nesselbush [D] | Sen. Dawn Euer [D] |
Sen. Ana Quezada [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-17 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-05-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/17/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2201.pdf |