RI S2193 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-18 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 18 2016 - 50% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-06-18 - Senate read and passed
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Requires that the tax imposed on little cigars be imposed in the same manner of the tax imposed on cigarettes, and that little cigars be sold in packs of twenty (20) or more.
Title
Little Cigar Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Daniel DaPonte [D] | Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 29 N: 2 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-17 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-06-15 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/17/2016) |
2016-03-10 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-08 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/10/2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |