RI S2185 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Amends general laws to reference the new council on elementary and secondary education and makes teacher certification provisions for military personnel.
Title
Certification Of Teachers
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/28/2018) |
2018-02-01 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2185.pdf |