RI S2185 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-27 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Extends the 2004 Renewable Energy Standard Schedule Program, which required the suppliers of retail electricity to purchase increasing minimum amounts of renewable energy from 2019 to 2035.
Title
Renewable Energy
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. William Conley [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] |
Sen. Juan Pichardo [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 3 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-06-16 - House - Passage (Y: 63 N: 9 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-05 - Senate - Passage (Y: 28 N: 6 NV: 4 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-27 | House | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-21 | House | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-06-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/18/2016) |
2016-06-16 | House | House passed Sub A |
2016-06-16 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/16/2016) |
2016-06-07 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-06-05 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/07/2016) |
2016-04-06 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-04-05 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2016-03-31 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/05/2016) |
2016-03-30 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-03-25 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (03/30/2016) |
2016-02-24 | Senate | Committee heard |
2016-02-22 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/24/2016) |
2016-01-27 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Environment and Agriculture |