RI S2160 | 2020 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on March 9 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-03-09 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the Honorable Stephen R. Ucci to join Darlene M. Boudreau and the Honorable Michael A. Morin in marriage on or about July 30, 2020, within the City of Warwick, Rhode Island.
Title
Relating To Solemnization Of Marriages
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2020-03-05 - House - Passage (Y: 66 N: 0 NV: 8 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2020-03-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2020-03-05 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2020-03-05 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2020-02-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (03/05/2020) |
2020-02-27 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2020-02-14 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/27/2020) |
2020-02-07 | House | Referred to House Special Legislation |
2020-02-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2020-02-05 | Senate | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar (02/06/2020) |
2020-02-04 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2020-01-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/04/2020) |
2020-01-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |