RI S2157 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-04-11 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Changes the last day for a request for municipal police arbitration agreement to 120 days before the expiration of the current collective bargaining agreement.
Title
Police Arbitration
Sponsors
Sen. Stephen Archambault [D] | Sen. Cynthia Coyne [D] | Sen. Paul Jabour [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-04-11 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-04-06 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (04/11/2018) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Labor |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2157.pdf |