RI S2143 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-03-06 - Withdrawn at sponsor's request
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Makes numerous changes to the procedures regarding the issuance of concealed carry permits, the fees associated with their issuance, and the public records accessible by the public in relating thereto.
Title
Weapons
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-03-06 | Senate | Withdrawn at sponsor's request |
2018-03-03 | Senate | Meeting postponed (03/06/2018) |
2018-03-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2143.pdf |