RI S2142 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 23 2018 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-05-31 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Criminalizes the knowing and intentional failure of a physician, nurse, or other licensed medical person to provide reasonable medical care and treatment to an infant born alive a felony and manslaughter if the infant dies.
Title
Children
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-05-31 | Senate | Committee heard |
2018-05-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing (05/31/2018) |
2018-01-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2142.pdf |