RI S2092 | 2014 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 21 2014 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2014-06-05 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Make unlawful the use of a non-hands-free mobile telephone while operating a motor vehicle, except for public safety personnel or in an emergency situation
Title
Mobile Telephone Use
Sponsors
Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardo [D] | Sen. William Walaska [D] | Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] |
Sen. Catherine Rumsey [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
Senate - Mobile telephone use approval of amendment lc 003279/2 (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2014-06-05 | House | Referred to House Judiciary |
2014-06-05 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A as amended (floor amendment) |
2014-06-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/05/2014) |
2014-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2014-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/15/2014) |
2014-02-06 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2014-02-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/06/2014) |
2014-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Judiciary |