RI S2076 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-07-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Amended) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes a special license plate for the Rocky Point Foundation, Inc., and specifies the fees and other conditions for issuance.
Title
Registration Of Vehicles -- Special Plate For Rocky Point Foundation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2016-06-18 - House - Passage as amended (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 9 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Plate for rocky point foundation approval of amendment lc 003155/2 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Plate for rocky point foundation approval of amendment lc 003155/2 (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-04-14 - Senate - Passage as amended (Y: 34 N: 3 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-07-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-07-01 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-18 | House | House passed as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-17 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/17/2016) |
2016-06-14 | House | Committee recommends passage as amended in concurrence |
2016-06-12 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/14/2016) |
2016-04-15 | House | Referred to House Finance |
2016-04-14 | Senate | Senate passed as amended (floor amendment) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (04/14/2016) |
2016-04-12 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2016-04-07 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (04/12/2016) |
2016-03-09 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-04 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/09/2016) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |