RI S2075 | 2024 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 8-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-24 - Referred to House State Government & Elections
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 23 2024 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2024-05-24 - Referred to House State Government & Elections
Pending: House State Government & Elections Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
STATE AFFAIRS AND GOVERNMENT -- OFFICE OF HEALTH AND HUMAN SERVICES - Requires the secretary of the executive office of health and human services to present to the general assembly a plan for the realignment of state hospitals into a department of hospitals no later than September 1, 2024.
Title
Requires the secretary of the executive office of health and human services to present to the general assembly a plan for the realignment of state hospitals into a department of hospitals no later than September 1, 2024.
Sponsors
Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Bridget Valverde [D] | Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] | Sen. Valarie Lawson [D] |
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Pamela Lauria [D] | Sen. Alana DiMario [D] | Sen. Linda Ujifusa [D] |
Roll Calls
2024-05-23 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2024-02-08 - Senate - Senate Committee on Health & Human Services: Be held for further study (Y: 6 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-05-24 | House | Referred to House State Government & Elections |
2024-05-23 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2024-05-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/23/2024) |
2024-05-16 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2024-05-15 | Senate | Proposed Substitute |
2024-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/16/2024) |
2024-02-08 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2024-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/08/2024) |
2024-01-12 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |