RI S2075 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Passed on June 6 2016 - 100% progression
Action: 2016-06-06 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Creates retailer Class WB license to purchase 500 to 2,000 gallons of wine from wholesaler for use in wholesale manufacture of wine biscuits. Said license-holder provides DBR the actual amount of wine purchased annually.
Title
Relating To Alcoholic Beverages
Sponsors
Sen. Dominick Ruggerio [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] |
Roll Calls
2016-06-02 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 69 N: 0 NV: 5 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2016-05-18 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-06-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2016-06-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2016-06-02 | House | House passed Sub A in concurrence |
2016-05-31 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/02/2016) |
2016-05-24 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2016-05-20 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/24/2016) |
2016-05-19 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2016-05-18 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2016-05-12 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/18/2016) |
2016-05-11 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2016-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/11/2016) |
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |