RI S2072 | 2020 | Regular Session

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 27 2020 - 100% progression
Action: 2020-06-27 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Prohibits commercial motor trucks, with a gross weight rating of twenty-six thousand one pounds (26,001 lbs.) or more, from traveling on Limerock Road, in Smithfield and Lincoln.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Size, Weight And Load Limits--smithfield And Lincoln

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2020-06-18 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2020-06-27SenateEffective without Governor's signature
2020-06-19SenateTransmitted to Governor
2020-06-18HouseHouse passed in concurrence
2020-06-18HousePlaced on the House Consent Calendar (06/18/2020)
2020-06-17SenateSenate read and passed
2020-06-15SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/17/2020)
2020-06-02SenateCommittee recommends passage
2020-05-29SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/02/2020)
2020-01-21SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback