RI S2072 | 2016 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 13 2016 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2016-03-23 - Committee heard
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a wine direct shipper license to allow for shipment of limited amounts of wine through the mail to eligible customers.
Title
Wine Direct Shipper License
Sponsors
Sen. Adam Satchell [D] | Sen. Frank Lombardi [D] | Sen. Susan Sosnowski [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Sen. Ryan Pearson [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2016-03-23 | Senate | Committee heard |
2016-03-18 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (03/23/2016) |
2016-01-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText16/SenateText16/S2072.pdf |