RI S2068 | 2022 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2022 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2022-02-15 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Exempts from the sales and use tax that portion of a motor vehicle lease payment collected for tangible personal property tax, municipal property tax, excise, or any other similar tax.
Title
Sales And Use Taxes -- Liability And Computation
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2022-02-15 - Senate - Senate Committee on Finance: Be held for further study (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 1) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-02-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2022-02-11 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/15/2022) |
2022-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |