RI S2032 | 2018 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-1)
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 11 2018 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2018-02-07 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Authorizes state higher education institutions to waive application and transcript fees for veterans.
Title
Fees For State Colleges And Universities - Veterans
Sponsors
Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Dennis Algiere [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2018-02-07 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2018-02-02 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (02/07/2018) |
2018-01-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Subjects
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText18/SenateText18/S2032.pdf |