RI S2022 | 2010 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-02 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on June 1 2010 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2010-06-02 - Referred to House Judiciary
Pending: House Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry - Dogs (provide Guidelines And Penalties For Any Person That Keeps A Dog Outside Tethered, Penned, Caged, Fenced Or Otherwise Confined Without Adequate Shelter)
Title
An Act Relating To Animals And Animal Husbandry - Dogs (provide Guidelines And Penalties For Any Person That Keeps A Dog Outside Tethered, Penned, Caged, Fenced Or Otherwise Confined Without Adequate Shelter)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2010-06-02 | Referred to House Judiciary | |
2010-06-01 | Senate read and passed | |
2010-05-26 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2010-05-26 | Committee recommends passage | |
2010-05-26 | Scheduled for consideration | |
2010-03-10 | Committee recommended measure be held for further study | |
2010-03-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2010-01-13 | Introduced, referred to Senate Constitutional and Regulatory Issues |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText10/SenateText10/S2022.pdf |