RI S0983 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on June 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on June 25 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-06-28 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Joint Resolution Amending The Joint Resolution Creating A Permanent Legislative Commission On Child Care In Rhode Island (this Resolution Would Amend The Membership And Purpose Of Said Commission, Allow For Funding With Approval, And Require Review Of Said Membership Every Two (2) Years.)
Title
Joint Resolution Amending The Joint Resolution Creating A Permanent Legislative Commission On Child Care In Rhode Island (this Resolution Would Amend The Membership And Purpose Of Said Commission, Allow For Funding With Approval, And Require Review Of Said Membership Every Two (2) Years.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-06-28 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Meeting postponed (06/30/2021) |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2021-06-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Education |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0983.pdf |