RI S0981 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 8 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-07-08 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Restricts the initial prescription to an adult and all prescriptions to a minor patient for an opiate to a seven (7) day supply with exceptions for certain conditions and medicines designed for substance abuse or opioid dependence treatment.
Title
Uniform Controlled Substances Act
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-06-28 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 68 N: 0 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-27 - Senate - Passage (Y: 38 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-07-08 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-07-03 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-28 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-28 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/28/2019) |
2019-06-27 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/27/2019) |
2019-06-25 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (06/25/2019) |
2019-06-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-06-14 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/18/2019) |
2019-06-13 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |