RI S0974 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 3-0)
Status: Passed on July 26 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-07-26 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Validates and ratify amendments to the Home Rule Charter of the town of Tiverton, which amendments were adopted and approved by the electors of the town of Tiverton on November 8, 2016.
Title
Validating And Ratifying An Amendment To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of Tiverton
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 65 N: 0 NV: 10 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-06-28 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-07-26 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-07-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-29 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-28 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/28/2017) |
2017-06-27 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-06-23 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/27/2017) |
2017-06-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |