RI S0969 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on July 14 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-07-14 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Allows the town of Barrington board of licenses to grant an exemption from the provisions of the statute regarding proximity to schools and churches relating to the issuance of an alcoholic beverage retail license for property located at 305 Sowams Road.
Title
Retail Sales
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2021-07-01 - House - Passage In Concurrence (Y: 67 N: 1 NV: 7 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-06-24 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-07-14 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2021-07-06 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2021-07-01 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2021-06-29 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (07/01/2021) |
2021-06-28 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2021-06-25 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/28/2021) |
2021-06-25 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government & Housing |
2021-06-24 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/24/2021) |
2021-06-23 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/23/2021) |
2021-06-21 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |