RI S0930 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 20 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-05-20 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Botvin Realty Company
Title
An Act Relating To Vacate The Forfeiture Or Revocation Of The Charter Botvin Realty Company
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-20 | Effective without Governor's signature | |
2011-05-12 | Transmitted to Governor | |
2011-05-12 | House passed in concurrence | |
2011-05-10 | Placed on House Calendar | |
2011-05-10 | Committee recommends passage in concurrence | |
2011-05-10 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-05-04 | Referred to House Corporations | |
2011-05-03 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-04-28 | Placed on the Senate Consent Calendar |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0930.pdf |