RI S0903 | 2013 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 2 2013 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2013-06-04 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Departments Of State Government (would Permit Department Directors To Enter Memoranda Of Understanding Providing For The Sharing Of Information Among Each Other That Would Improve The Effective Administration And Function Of Their Departments.)
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Departments Of State Government (would Permit Department Directors To Enter Memoranda Of Understanding Providing For The Sharing Of Information Among Each Other That Would Improve The Effective Administration And Function Of Their Departments.)
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-06-04 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2013-05-31 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/04/2013) |
2013-05-02 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText13/SenateText13/S0903.pdf |