RI S0890 | 2019 | Regular Session

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Engrossed on June 25 2019 - 50% progression
Action: 2019-06-26 - Referred to House H.E.W.
Pending: House Health, Education and Welfare Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]

Summary

Requires that only certified nurses-teachers may be employed as school nurses in elementary and secondary schools.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

Certified Nurse-teacher

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-06-25 - Senate - Passage (Y: 37 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-06-26HouseReferred to House H.E.W.
2019-06-25SenateSenate read and passed
2019-06-19SenatePlaced on Senate Calendar (06/25/2019)
2019-06-19SenateCommittee recommends passage
2019-06-14SenateScheduled for consideration (06/19/2019)
2019-06-12SenateCommittee recommended measure be held for further study
2019-06-07SenateScheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/12/2019)
2019-05-22SenateIntroduced, referred to Senate Education

Rhode Island State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback