RI S0886 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-30 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on May 11 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2017-06-30 - Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence
Text: Latest bill text (Comm Sub) [PDF]
Summary
Requires pub. utilities/electric distribution co. to provide prompt/adequate service to ratepayers for new service/ upgrades w/penalty of up to $1,000 with electric distribution co. to provide written estimates/itemized bill for work in excess of $500.
Title
Duties Of Utilities And Carriers
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-29 - Senate - Passage (Y: 36 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-30 | House | Committee recommends passage of Sub A in concurrence |
2017-06-30 | House | Scheduled for consideration (06/30/2017) |
2017-06-30 | House | Referred to House Corporations |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Senate passed Sub A |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/29/2017) |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage of Sub A |
2017-06-29 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/29/2017) |
2017-05-18 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2017-05-12 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/18/2017) |
2017-05-11 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Commerce |