RI S0859 | 2021 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 5-0)
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on April 30 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-05-13 - Committee recommended measure be held for further study
Pending: Senate Health and Human Services Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides that health insurance contributions made by enrollees for cost sharing requirements include those amounts paid by the enrollee or another person on behalf of the enrollee.
Title
Prescription Drug Benefits
Sponsors
Sen. Hanna Gallo [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Joshua Miller [D] | Sen. Frank Ciccone [D] |
Sen. Maryellen Goodwin [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-13 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2021-05-07 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/13/2021) |
2021-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Health and Human Services |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText21/SenateText21/S0859.pdf |