RI S0837 | 2019 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 21 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-06-21 - Signed by Governor
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Provides a petition process to have a discharge from service recorded as honorable for members of the armed services separated from service with a general or other than honorable discharge due solely to their sexual orientation/gender identity/expression.
Title
Recordation Of Honorable Discharges
Sponsors
Sen. Dawn Euer [D] | Sen. Michael McCaffrey [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] | Sen. Erin Lynch Prata [D] |
Sen. Melissa Murray [D] | Sen. Gayle Goldin [D] |
Roll Calls
2019-06-19 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 75 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-06-06 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-06-21 | Senate | Signed by Governor |
2019-06-19 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2019-06-19 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2019-06-14 | House | Placed on House Calendar (06/19/2019) |
2019-06-13 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2019-06-07 | House | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (06/13/2019) |
2019-06-07 | House | Referred to House Veterans Affairs |
2019-06-06 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2019-06-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (06/06/2019) |
2019-05-29 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2019-05-24 | Senate | Scheduled for consideration (05/29/2019) |
2019-05-15 | Senate | Committee recommended measure be held for further study |
2019-05-10 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/15/2019) |
2019-04-30 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |