RI S0798 | 2011 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Engrossed on May 25 2011 - 50% progression, died in committee
Action: 2011-05-26 - Referred to House Finance
Pending: House Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Video Lottery Terminal: provide that any net terminal income paid to UTGR or Newport Grand related to the marketing program shall be paid out of the share of net terminal income disbursed as an administrative expense of the division of state lottery
Title
An Act Relating To State Affairs And Government - Video Lottery Terminal
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-26 | Referred to House Finance | |
2011-05-25 | Senate read and passed | |
2011-05-19 | Placed on Senate Calendar | |
2011-05-18 | Committee recommends passage | |
2011-05-18 | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration | |
2011-03-24 | Introduced, referred to Senate Special Legislation and Veterans Affairs |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://dirac.rilin.state.ri.us/BillStatus/WebClass1.ASP?WCI=BillStatus&WCE=ifrmBillStatus&WCU |
Text | https://www.rilin.state.ri.us/BillText11/SenateText11/S0798.pdf |