RI S0791 | 2017 | Regular Session
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 22 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-06-22 - Effective without Governor's signature
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Ratifies and validates the amendments to the Warren Home Rule Charter which were approved by the electors of the town of Warren at the polls on November 8, 2016.
Title
Validating And Ratifying Amendments To The Home Rule Charter Of The Town Of Warren
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-06-14 - House - Passage in concurrence (Y: 72 N: 0 NV: 3 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-05-10 - Senate - Passage (Y: 35 N: 0 NV: 2 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-06-22 | Senate | Effective without Governor's signature |
2017-06-14 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor |
2017-06-14 | House | House passed in concurrence |
2017-06-09 | House | Placed on the House Consent Calendar (06/14/2017) |
2017-05-31 | House | Committee recommends passage in concurrence |
2017-05-26 | House | Scheduled for consideration (05/31/2017) |
2017-05-11 | House | Referred to House Municipal Government |
2017-05-10 | Senate | Senate read and passed |
2017-05-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Calendar (05/10/2017) |
2017-05-03 | Senate | Committee recommends passage |
2017-04-28 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration (05/03/2017) |
2017-04-25 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Housing and Municipal Government |