RI S0785 | 2023 | Regular Session
Status
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Democrat 4-1)
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Meeting postponed (05/09/2023)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on March 23 2023 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2023-05-08 - Meeting postponed (05/09/2023)
Pending: Senate Finance Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Introduced) [PDF]
Summary
Creates a restricted receipt account wherein fifteen percent (15%) of revenue collected from the gasoline tax shall be deposited into the account each year and used for the implementation of capital improvements on local public ways in each municipality.
Title
Motor Fuel Tax
Sponsors
Sen. Samuel Zurier [D] | Sen. Mark McKenney [D] | Sen. Walter Felag [D] | Sen. Gordon Rogers [R] |
Sen. Roger Picard [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-08 | Senate | Meeting postponed (05/09/2023) |
2023-05-05 | Senate | Scheduled for hearing and/or consideration |
2023-03-23 | Senate | Introduced, referred to Senate Finance |
Rhode Island State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://status.rilegislature.gov/ |
Text | https://webserver.rilegislature.gov/BillText23/SenateText23/S0785.pdf |